American Safety Indemnity Company v. Sun-Pointe Holdings, LLC

Plaintiff: American Safety Indemnity Company
Defendant: Sun-Pointe Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00252
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David James Pettinato for Sun-Pointe Holdings, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/23/2013. (blf)
August 26, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties file an agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal within (30) days, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/26/2014. (tmg)
September 26, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Either party may petition the Court to reopen the case upon a finding of cause. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 09/26/2014. (jlk)
September 26, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 09/26/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 09/26/2014. (jlk)
August 23, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Steven J. Kyle for American Safety Indemnity Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/23/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Safety Indemnity Company v. Sun-Pointe Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kerry Link Traynum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun-Pointe Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.