Prudhomme v. Masonite Corp.

Plaintiff: Jessica Prudhomme
Defendant: Masonite Corp.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00275
Filed: May 3, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Emily Dale Blaiss for Masonite Corp.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/25/2014. (eef)
March 14, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss ; denying as moot in part and denying without prejudice in part 11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/13/2014. (eef)
March 31, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Joint MOTION to Refer Case to Mediation, to Extend the Case Schedule and for a Status Conference. Specifically, the Motion is GRANTED with respect to the Parties request for a judicial settlement conference with Judge Keesler and an extension on the mediation deadline, and DENIED with respect to the Parties request that the discovery completion deadline and dispositive motions deadline be extended. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/31/2014. (eef)
April 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sua sponte for the scheduling of a Judicial Settlement Conference. ( Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/21/2014. (eef)
May 29, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Settlement (Case Settlement Deadline 6/18/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/29/2014. (tmg)
July 1, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gavin Stone Appleby for Masonite Corp.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/28/2013. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudhomme v. Masonite Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Prudhomme
Represented By: Carlos D. Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masonite Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]