Sayman et al v. Lehman Brothers FSB et al

Plaintiff: Robert W. Sayman and Mary B Sayman
Defendant: Lehman Brothers FSB, Volkswagen Bank USA and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00288
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Granting 9 motion to amend complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/16/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
December 4, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lehman Brothers FSB, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC ( Objections to M&R due by 12/23/2013), ORDER granting 18 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice, ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/3/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
February 11, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Volkswagen Bank USA ( Objections to M&R due by 2/28/2014), ORDER granting re 26 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/11/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
March 5, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting 23 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/4/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
March 5, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/4/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
May 16, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 32 Memorandum and Recommendations.; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/16/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
May 16, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/16/14. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 5/16/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Main Document 42 replaced on 5/16/2014) (mga) NEF regenerated on 5/16/2014 (mga).
February 25, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/25/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayman et al v. Lehman Brothers FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Sayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B Sayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Bank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Dennis Kyle Deak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.