Aderholt et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Gary Aderholt and Kimberly Adams
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc. and Charlotte Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00381
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution Of Declaratory Judgment Act Against United States Department Of Health & Human Services. This matter is STAYED until otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 09/17/2014. (jlk)
January 20, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Lift Stay. Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 31, 2015, to file supplemental briefing regarding her Motion for Summary Judgment, and Defendants shall have fourteen days thereafter to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/20/2015. (eef)
February 24, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 Case Settlement Notice. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal in this case, or in the alternative request an extension of time to file such dismissal, on or before March 20, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/24/2015. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aderholt et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Aderholt
Represented By: Vernon Rollins Sumwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Adams
Represented By: Vernon Rollins Sumwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]