Moates v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Mildred Moates
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00382
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; denying as Moot 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/08/2014. (jlk)
September 25, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Declaratory Judgment and Mandamus Action against the USDHHS and of Underlying Litigation before the North Carolina Industrial Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/25/2014. (eef)
December 22, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Lift Stay and for Entry of Scheduling Order, Discovery Completion is due February 20, 2015, Dispositive Motions are due March 20, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/20/2014. (jlk)
May 19, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Scheduling Deadlines. All deadlines in the current action are hereby stayed and the parties shall have up to and including July 9, 2015 to file a Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/19/2015. (chh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moates v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Moates
Represented By: Woodrow Wilson Gunter, II
Represented By: Vernon Rollins Sumwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.