Caldwell v. Shaw Industries Group, Inc. et al

Defendant: Shaw Industries Long Term Disability Coverage Plan, The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Shaw Industries Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Norman Patrick Caldwell
Case Number: 3:2013cv00391
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ian Morrison for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/3/2013. (tmg)
July 3, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Megan E. Troy for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/3/2013. (tmg)
November 14, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 19 Memorandum and Recommendations; denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/13/13. (emw)
December 11, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring the parties to file by December 31, 2013, a short brief asserting the applicable standard of review.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/11/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Shaw Industries Group, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Industries Long Term Disability Coverage Plan
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Page
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Matthew K. Lilly
Represented By: Ian Morrison
Represented By: Megan E. Troy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Industries Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Page
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Patrick Caldwell
Represented By: Julie Hanna Fosbinder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]