Blackwell v. The Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond

Defendant: The Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond
Plaintiff: Margaretta C. Blackwell
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00431
Filed: July 29, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441cv Notice of Removal - Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/11/2014. (tmg)
September 23, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 18 Report of Mediation, parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal in this case, or in the alternative request an extension of time to file such dismissal, on or before October 8, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 09/23/2014. (jlk)
July 30, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David E. Nagle for The Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/30/2013. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blackwell v. The Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond
Represented By: Patricia Lee Holland
Represented By: Paul Siegfried Holscher
Represented By: David E. Nagle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaretta C. Blackwell
Represented By: Geraldine Sumter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]