Mcghee v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Martin Mcghee
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2013cv00481
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Cross be calendared and noticed for hearing by the Clerk of Court. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/25/2014. (eef)
October 29, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/28/2014. (eef)
October 29, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/28/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
February 6, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 02/06/2015. (jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcghee v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Mcghee
Represented By: Ross Sohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.