Black v. F&S, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Larry Black
Defendant: Estate of Fischer, Robert E. Connolly, F. Walter Riebenack and Riebenack & Connolly
Case Number: 5:2002cv00105
Filed: September 9, 2002
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Richard Voorhees.) Trial is scheduled to commence on Monday, 10/20/2008 at 9:30 AM; see Order for further instructions and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/3/2008. (cbb)
October 9, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ordering that plf's claims with respect to dfts F & S, LLC (a/k/a Fischer-Schindler, LLC), James F. Garro, and Sienna Financial Ltd. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) OF FRCvP. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/9/2008. (cbb)
December 2, 2008 82 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Estate of Doss Fischer in amount of $1,000,000, plus pre-judgment interest. It is further ordered that plf's request for treble damages is granted. Plf's Motion for Attorneys' Fees is denied. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 12/2/2008. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. F&S, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Black
Represented By: John Francis Hanzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Walter Riebenack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riebenack & Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.