Stockner v. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.

Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Plaintiff: James L. Stockner
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00013
Filed: January 31, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Catawba
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 Dft's MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer ordering that Plaintiff shall file a response to the pending motion on or before 3/8/12. Failure to do so will likely lead to the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/1/12. (smj)
May 21, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Defendant shall Show Cause by 5/25/2012 why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendant's filing on or before 6/1/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/18/12. (smj)
June 29, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case be remanded to the General Court of Justice, Superior Court Division, Catawba County, North Carolina. This Court lacks jurisdiction over this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/28/12. (smj)
June 29, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 6/29/12. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (smj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stockner v. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Canipe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Stockner
Represented By: Wesley William Barkley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]