Cerven et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina et al

Plaintiff: CFW Vending LLC, SHGI Corporation, Kelli R. Cerven, Keith O. Cerven and Teresa M. Cerven
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina and Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00017
Filed: February 7, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
 
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Daniel E. Laytin for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/2/12. (smj)
March 2, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added David J. Zott for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/2/12. (smj)
March 2, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Ian R. Conner for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/2/12. (smj)
March 2, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added J. Robert Robertson for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/2/12. (smj)
March 2, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added N. Thomas Connally, III for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/2/12. (smj)
March 2, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Emily M. Yinger for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/2/12. (smj)
March 2, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Justin W. Bernick for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/2/12. (smj)
March 2, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Thomas M. Trucksess for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/2/12. (smj)
March 21, 2012 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert F. Leibenluft for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/20/12. (smj)
March 30, 2012 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added William A. Isaacson for CFW Vending LLC, Keith O. Cerven, Kelli R. Cerven, Teresa M. Cerven, SHGI Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/30/2012. (cbb)
March 30, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Kathleen Kiernan for CFW Vending LLC, Keith O. Cerven, Kelli R. Cerven, Teresa M. Cerven, SHGI Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/30/2012. (cbb) Modified on 3/30/2012 (cbb) to regenerate NEF and e-mail order to Atty Kiernan.
April 3, 2012 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Michael D. Hausfeld for CFW Vending LLC, Keith O. Cerven, Kelli R. Cerven, Teresa M. Cerven, SHGI Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/3/2012. (cbb)
April 5, 2012 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Arthur Bailey, Jr. for CFW Vending LLC, Keith O. Cerven, Kelli R. Cerven, Teresa M. Cerven, SHGI Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/5/12. (smj)
May 3, 2012 63 Featured Case ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Cyril V. Smith for CFW Vending LLC, Keith O. Cerven, Kelli R. Cerven, Teresa M. Cerven, and SHGI Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/2/12. (smj)
May 3, 2012 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Carl S. Kravitz for CFW Vending LLC, Keith O. Cerven, Kelli R. Cerven, Teresa M. Cerven, and SHGI Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/2/12. (smj)
May 30, 2012 69 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Daniel P. Moylan for CFW Vending LLC, Keith O. Cerven, Kelli R. Cerven, Teresa M. Cerven, and SHGI Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/29/12. (smj)
November 30, 2012 88 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution of Section 1407 Transfer Motion, ( Status Report due by 2/1/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/30/12. (bsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cerven et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CFW Vending LLC
Represented By: Larry Stephen McDevitt
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHGI Corporation
Represented By: Larry Stephen McDevitt
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli R. Cerven
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Represented By: Larry Stephen McDevitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith O. Cerven
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Represented By: Larry Stephen McDevitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Cerven
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Represented By: Larry Stephen McDevitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina
Represented By: Justin W Bernick
Represented By: Adam H. Charnes
Represented By: Nathaniel Thomas Connally, III
Represented By: Chad Dwight Hansen
Represented By: J. Robert Robertson
Represented By: Daniel R. Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Trucksess
Represented By: Emily M. Yinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Represented By: Ian R. Conner
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Represented By: James Thomas Williams, Jr.
Represented By: David J. Zott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]