Araya v. Gawker Media, LLC et al

Defendant: Gawker Media, LLC and Deep Dive Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Francis Araya
Case Number: 5:2012cv00163
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 8/20/13. (smj)
August 23, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Order Directing Service By Delivery To Secretary Of State. Plaintiff may effect service on Dft Deep Dive Media, LLC, by delivering by hand a copy of the Summons, Complaint, and this Order to th e Secretary of State of California, or to any person employed in the Secretary of State's office in the capacity of assistant or deputy, pursuant to Cal.Corp.Code Section 1702 and Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(h)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/23/2013. (cbb)
October 9, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Seth D. Berlin for Gawker Media, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/9/2013. (cbb)
October 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Thomas Curley for Gawker Media, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/10/13. (smj)
February 3, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/3/2014. (cbb)
November 5, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Cameron Stracher for Gawker Media, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/5/2012. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Araya v. Gawker Media, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gawker Media, LLC
Represented By: Cameron Stracher
Represented By: James B. Gatehouse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep Dive Media, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Araya
Represented By: Christopher D. Mauriello
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]