Wallace v. Crawford

Appellant: Hugh Wallace
Appellee: Barrett L. Crawford
Case Number: 5:2012cv00201
Filed: December 19, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings. Staying all deadlines imposed by Bankruptcy Rule 8009 until June 26, 2013. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 4/9/13. (smj) Modified on 4/9/2013 to show case stayed until 6/26/13 (smj).
June 13, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 5 Motion to Stay. The stay of Rule 8009 deadlines will remain in effect through Monday, August 12, 2013. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 6/13/2013. (cbb)
November 6, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 11/6/2013. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hugh Wallace
Represented By: David Russell Badger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barrett L. Crawford
Represented By: John W. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.