JOAO Control & Monitoring Systems, LLC v. Lowe's Companies, Inc.

Counter_defendant: JOAO Control & Monitoring Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: JOAO Control & Monitoring Systems, LLC
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00056
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Michael A. Oakes for Lowe's Companies, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/21/13. (smj)
July 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Steven L. Wood for Lowe's Companies, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/3/13. (smj)
February 18, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 2/18/14. (smj)
April 29, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Steven W. Ritcheson for JOAO Control & Monitoring Systems, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/28/2013. (cbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JOAO Control & Monitoring Systems, LLC v. Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: JOAO Control & Monitoring Systems, LLC
Represented By: Steven W Ritcheson
Represented By: Brian Leighton Kinsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAO Control & Monitoring Systems, LLC
Represented By: Steven W Ritcheson
Represented By: Brian Leighton Kinsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Romanzo
Represented By: Michael A. Oakes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Romanzo
Represented By: Michael A. Oakes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]