Houck v. LifeStore Bank et al

Defendant: Grid Financial Services, Inc., LifeStore Bank and Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Diana Louise Houck and Steven G. Tate
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00066
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Ashe
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 5/13/2013. (tmg)
June 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Michael David Paul for Grid Financial Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Cayer on 6/18/13. (smj) Modified on 6/18/2013 to change from Judge Voorhees as signer to Judge Cayer. (smj).
August 27, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend/Correct; plfs shall file their Second Amended Complaint within 5 days of this Order; denying as moot 39 Motion to Strike Plf's Response; denying as moot without prejudice 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/27/2013. (cbb)
October 1, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint is Dismissed With Prejudice as to Defendant Substitute Trustee Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/1/13. (smj)
December 3, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Grid Financial Services, Inc. to file a reply brief in support of its 54 Motion to Dismiss w/i 14 days of entry of this Order. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cla im . Among other issues, dft shall address whether and when it had notice of plf's 12/16/2011 bankruptcy petition and the effect of such notice or lack of notice. ( Replies due by 12/17/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/2/2013. (cbb)
January 7, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/7/2014. (cbb)
January 15, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/15/14. (smj)
May 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice plf's 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, as a motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 5/6/2013. (cbb)
February 20, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 70 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/20/14. (smj)
February 20, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 2/20/14. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (smj)
October 14, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion to Reopen Case; denying 77 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/14/14. (smj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Houck v. LifeStore Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grid Financial Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifeStore Bank
Represented By: John Benjamin Reeves
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Louise Houck
Represented By: Micheal Shane Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven G. Tate
Represented By: Micheal Shane Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]