Marden v. Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: Allen Marden
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00015
Filed: February 7, 2011
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 5, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion for Hearing (CP)
March 10, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William D. Hittler. (BG) Regenerated NEF to William D. Hittler on 3/10/2011. (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marden v. Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Marden
Represented By: Steven L. Latham
Represented By: Thomas M. Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William D. Hittler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]