Smallwood v. Anschutz Exploration Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Eric Smallwood
Defendant: Anschutz Exploration Corporation and Bronco Drilling Company, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00070
Filed: August 29, 2011
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Dunn
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2013 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 8, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending pretrial deadlines: Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/1/2012. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/1/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 5/2/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
June 6, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (amended) granting 40 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. All pretrial deadlines are suspended pending further order of the court. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (amended to correct date of order)(BG)
September 12, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 11, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 6, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/10/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smallwood v. Anschutz Exploration Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Smallwood
Represented By: Michael R. Hoffman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anschutz Exploration Corporation
Represented By: Kristy L. Albrecht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronco Drilling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]