Due v. Nabors Drilling USA, LP et al

Plaintiff: Kathryne Due
Defendant: Nabors Drilling USA, LP and John Does I-V
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00032
Filed: March 26, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Dunn
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2014 at 02:30 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
March 28, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emily R. Rankin. (BG) NEF regenerated to Rankin on 3/28/2012. (rm)
July 9, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Due v. Nabors Drilling USA, LP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryne Due
Represented By: R. Daniel Fleck
Represented By: Emily R. Rankin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabors Drilling USA, LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-V
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]