Bruesch v. Flanagan et al

Defendant: Todd Flanagan, Sean Conway and Brandon Gumke
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dodge Bruesch
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00083
Filed: June 28, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 112 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 100 Motion to Continue; finding as moot 107 Motion for Extension of Time (Extend Time for Pre-Trial Conference). The final pretrial conference set for 11/15/2013 and trial set for 12/3/2013 are cancelled with the understanding that they will be rescheduled at a date and time to be determined. (BG) Distributed on 11/5/2013 (jt).
January 10, 2014 117 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 114 Motion (Request for Rescheduled Trial - Postponement Plans); denying 115 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. (BG) Distributed on 1/10/2014 (jt).
March 11, 2014 118 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 83 Motion for Discovery; granting 89 Motion to Strike insofar as it asks the court to disregard Bruesch's claims of misconduct; finding as moot 91 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. (BG)
March 17, 2014 119 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 104 Motion to Compel. (BG) Distributed on 3/17/2014. (rh)
March 24, 2014 123 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 121 Motion for Reconsideration. (BG) Distributed on 3/24/2014 (jt).
August 10, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff granted leave to file second amended complaint. Second amended complaint due by 9/10/2012. The 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 Complaint filed by Nicholas Dodge Bruesch is deemed moot. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 8/10/2012 (jt).
December 18, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER: Parties are to submit proposed scheduling/discovery plans by 2/1/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Sample Scheduling/Discovery Plan)(BG) Distributed on 12/18/2012. (rs)
December 26, 2012 46 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 41 Motion for Reconsideration of Appointment of Counsel. (KT)
January 10, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2013 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 29, 2013 70 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 64 Motion Production of Documents; finding as moot 67 Motion to Compel. (BG) Distributed on 4/29/2013 (rs).
June 3, 2013 81 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 77 Motion for Discovery. (BG) Distributed on 6/3/2013 (jt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bruesch v. Flanagan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Flanagan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Conway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Gumke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dodge Bruesch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]