North Dakota v. United States of America

Plaintiff: North Dakota
Defendant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00125
Filed: September 14, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 50 Motion to Stay jurisdictional discovery due to lapse in appropriations. (BG)
January 23, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re amendments to the Third Amended Scheduling/Discover Plan forJurisdictional Discovery. The "first round" of depositions to be completed by 3/28/2014. Identities of declarants to be disclosed by 4/10/2014. Depositions of additional declarants to be completed by 6/06/2014. Defendant's amended motion to dismisss due by 8/15/2014. Plaintiffs' response due by 10/17/2014. Defendant has 45 days to file a reply. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 6, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Submission of Documents for In Camera Review. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: North Dakota v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota
Represented By: Charles M. Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen G. Bartell
Represented By: Sara Porsia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]