Bayley v. MDU Resources Group, Inc.

Defendant: MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sylvia Bayley
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
September 30, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 3/20/2015 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previously set for 10/14/2014). Jury Trial REset for 4/6/2015 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days) (Previously set for 10/27/2014) By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 23, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bayley v. MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca S. Thiem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Bayley
Represented By: Irvin B. Nodland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]