St. Hilaire Seed Company, Inc. v. Falkirk Farmers Elevator Co. et al

Plaintiff: St. Hilaire Seed Company, Inc.
Defendant: Falkirk Farmers Elevator Co. and Ronald J. Hefta
Case Number: 1:2013cv00028
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: McLean
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark J. Kalla; granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for AttorneyMarta M. Chou. (KT)
May 6, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
June 6, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emily Grande Stearns. (KT) NEF regenerated to Stearns on 6/6/2013. (rm)
March 11, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura N. Maupin. (BG) NEF regenerated to Maupin. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Hilaire Seed Company, Inc. v. Falkirk Farmers Elevator Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Hilaire Seed Company, Inc.
Represented By: Marc A. Al
Represented By: Tina A. Syring-Petrochhi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falkirk Farmers Elevator Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J. Hefta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]