Green v. Smedberg

Defendant: Donald Smedberg
Plaintiff: Amanda Green
Case Number: 1:2013cv00037
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 12, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 9, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Dispositive Motion Deadline, Final Pretrial Conference, and Jury Trial: Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2015. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/2/2015 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Previously set for 11/4/2014. Jury Trial reset for 6/15/2015 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days, #2 on civil calendar). Previously set for 11/17/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 28, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney E. Blake Paul. (KT) NEF regenerated to Blake Paul on 5/28/2013. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Smedberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Smedberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Green
Represented By: Rodney E. Pagel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]