Chapman et al v. Hiland Partners, LLC

Plaintiff: Lenny M. Chapman and Tracy M. Chapman
Defendant: Hiland Operating, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00052
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court Supplemental Order re Motion to Compel Discovery by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(CSM)
January 24, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Establishing Discovery Dispute Procedure. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
January 24, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Discussion of the Advisability of Early Settlement. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 4, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Deadlines for Document Production. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
April 1, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 128 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley L. Booke. (BG)
April 16, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 116 Motion to Compel. (KT)
April 21, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 142 Motion re Neuropsychological Materials. (KT)
May 5, 2014 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 157 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John M. Fitzpatrick; granting 158 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John M. Stephen E. Oertle. (KT)
May 6, 2014 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 156 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (KT)
May 29, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 164 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting 166 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (KT)
May 29, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part 139 Motion to Compel. (KT)
August 20, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 169 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 181 Motion to Compel; and finding as moot 205 Motion to Compel. (KT)
August 20, 2014 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Suspending Discovery Deadlines. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
September 10, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 120 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (MM)
June 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 6, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Jury Trial set for 1/26/2015 and Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2015 are CANCELLED. Dispositive Motions are due within 10 days of Missouri Basin receiving a copy of the settlement documents. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
July 16, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margaret M. Clarke. (BG) Distributed to Clarke on 7/16/2013. (rm)
August 1, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
November 5, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KT)
December 10, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Discovery Hearing set for 12/17/2013 at 2:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Miller's conference room before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 26, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part 78 Motion to Compel; granting 80 Motion to Quash; granting 82 Motion to Quash. (KT)
December 31, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Suspending Discovery Deadlines and Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 2/4/2014 at 10:00 AM CST by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The parties shall call the telephone number and enter the access code provided by separate email. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 3, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert P. Schuster; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dennis P. Wilkinson. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chapman et al v. Hiland Partners, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenny M. Chapman
Represented By: Dennis P. Wilkinson
Represented By: Robert P. Schuster
Represented By: David S. Maring
Represented By: James R Hoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy M. Chapman
Represented By: James R Hoy
Represented By: David S. Maring
Represented By: Robert P. Schuster
Represented By: Dennis P. Wilkinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiland Operating, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]