State of North Dakota et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: Texas, Nevada, South Dakota and North Dakota
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00109
Filed: September 12, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7413
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2014 at 3:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 13, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Amended): Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2014 at 3:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (amended to correct scrivener's error) (BG)
January 13, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's motion re stay and an abeyance due by 2/14/2014. Plaintiffs' response due by 3/7/2014. Defendant's reply due by 3/21/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 24, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Belinda A. Suwe. (KT) NEF regenerated to PHV attorney on 9/24/2013. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State of North Dakota et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas
Represented By: Mark L. Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada
Represented By: Belinda A. Suwe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota
Represented By: Charles D. McGuigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota
Represented By: Paul M. Seby
Represented By: Margaret I. Olson
Represented By: Marian Camille Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]