Merrill et al. v. National Oilwell Varco, L.P., et al.

Defendant: Pinnacle Services, Inc., Environmental Materials, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, L.P. and Chimney Butte Environmental LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Merrill
 
Case Number: 1:2014cv00059
Filed: June 6, 2014
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Dunn
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert McGee Bowick; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice forJohn Wesley Raley, III; granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bradford Turner Laney. (BG)
August 1, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2014 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The parties shall call the number and enter the access code provided.(KT)
September 4, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2016 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Merrill et al. v. National Oilwell Varco, L.P., et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Materials, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco, L.P.
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chimney Butte Environmental LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Merrill
Represented By: Stacy Deery Stennes(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Thomas J. Conlin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]