Feller v. National Action Financial Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bryan Feller
Defendant: National Action Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2008cv00030
Filed: February 29, 2008
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McHenry
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2009 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 2, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2009 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 5, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The conference shall be conducted via telephone conference call be to initiated by the court. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 17, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 24 Motion to Dismiss. (LUKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feller v. National Action Financial Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Feller
Represented By: Stanley J. Boehm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Action Financial Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]