Monson v. Zenergy, Inc.

Plaintiff: Linda Monson
Defendant: Zenergy, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv00091
Filed: October 23, 2008
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2009 13 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2009 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 19, 2009 15 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2010 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 19, 2009 16 Featured Case ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/9/2009 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 11, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER adopting 52 Stipulation to File Second Amended Third-Party Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 2, 2008 5 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2009 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 28, 2010 68 Featured Case ORDER adopting 67 Stipulation. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 29, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER (amended) re 67 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Move to Sever or Bifurcate. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 9, 2010 73 Featured Case ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 4/21/2010 at 8:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. A Status Conference with Defendant and Third-Party Defendant set for 4/12/2010 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed. (rs)
December 17, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 8 Motion to Postpone Date of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling conference set for 1/6/2009 is cancelled and shall be rescheduled at a date to be determined. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monson v. Zenergy, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Monson
Represented By: Sarah M. Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenergy, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]