Gustafson v. Poitra et al

Plaintiff: Darrel Gustafson
Defendant: Sandra Poitra, All Persons Unknown, Turtle Mountain Tribal Court and Bureau of Indian Affairs
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv00016
Filed: April 8, 2009
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Rent Lease & Ejectment Office
County: Rolette
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2009 14 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. The temporary restraining order is extended until May 6, 2009. The show cause hearing is re-scheduled for April 28, 2009. (LUKH) Distributed to Sandra Poitra via certified mail, return receipt on 4/22/2009 (rm).
April 30, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(LUKH)
May 27, 2009 35 Featured Case ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2009 at 11:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 5/27/2009 (ks).
June 17, 2009 49 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(LR) Distributed on 6/17/2009 (ks).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gustafson v. Poitra et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Gustafson
Represented By: Debra L. Hoffarth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Poitra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Mountain Tribal Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]