Campbell et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: Robert C. Campbell and Brenda Southern
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, Roland S. Pederson and KC Transport, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv00049
Filed: August 17, 2009
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part 77 KC Transport, LLC and Roland S. Pederson's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (CP)
January 24, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Summary Judgment (CP)
November 6, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2011 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 2, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part 111 BNSF Railway Company's Motion in Limine dated January 31, 2011 (CP)
March 2, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part, denying in part, and deferring in part 113 Roland S. Pederson and KC Transport, LLC's Motion in Limine (CP)
March 2, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part 114 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (CP)
March 2, 2011 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 118 BNSF Railway Company's Motion in Limine RE: BNSF Employee Cheryl Bonebrake (CP)
March 2, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland finding as moot 119 BNSF Railway Company's Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Donald L. Asa; granting in part and deferring in part 155 BNSF Railway Company's Amended Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Donald L. Asa (CP)
March 2, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 121 BNSF Railway Company's Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs' Wage Loss Claim (CP)
March 2, 2011 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying in part and deferring in part 123 Berthold Farmers' Elevator's Motion in Limine (CP)
January 22, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 17 Stipulation to Serve Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 2, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re 52 Stipulation filed by BNSF Railway Company by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 12/1/2010. Dispositive motions due by 10/29/2010. Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures due by 9/1/2010. Defendant's expert witness disclosures due by 10/15/2010. Discovery depositions of expert witnesses due by 12/1/2010. (CAS)
August 17, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 MOTION For an Order by the Court determining whether there is subject matter jurisdiction over Roland S. Pederson and KC Trasnport, LLC by Judge Daniel L. Hovland (RAB)
September 14, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants expert disclosures due by 11/1/2010. Plaintiffs rebuttal expert disclosures due by 12/01/2010. Settlement Conference set for 12/14/2010 at 8:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 14, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (AMENDED): Defendants expert disclosures due by 11/1/2010. Plaintiffs rebuttal expert disclosures due by 12/01/2010. Settlement Conference set for 12/14/2010 at 8:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Amending original order to correct scrivener's error re the time for the settlement conference). (BG)
October 26, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 71 Stipulation to extend dispositive motion deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2010. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 2, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (CP)
September 21, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2009 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 15, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr (CAS) Regenerated NEF to Richard L. Carlson on 12/15/2010. (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Campbell et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Campbell
Represented By: Cortney S. LeNeave
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Southern
Represented By: Cortney S. LeNeave
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland S. Pederson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Transport, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]