Goheen v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Ramona Goheen
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00021
Filed: February 22, 2011
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/13/2012. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/29/2012. Discovery depositions of expert witnesses to be completed by 6/27/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 30, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the parties' 20 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 11/22/2012. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/15/2012. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/30/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 7, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2012 reset for 9/4/2013 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 26, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 26 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling/Discovery Plan and Continue Trial Date. Discovery due by 3/1/2013. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/1/2013. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/30/2012. Discovery depositions of expert witnesses to be completed by 4/19/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
September 27, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 28 Amended Stipulation to Modify Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 3/1/2013. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/1/2013. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/15/2013. Discovery depositions of expert witnesses to be completed by 4/19/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Goheen v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Goheen
Represented By: Thomas William Geng
Represented By: Fredric A. Bremseth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: James S. Hill
Represented By: Rebecca S. Thiem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]