Delorme v. Autos Inc et al

Defendant: RW Enterprises Inc, Robert Opperude, Randy Westby and Autos Inc
Plaintiff: Bonnie Delorme
Case Number: 4:2011cv00039
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 8, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 30 Motion to Certify Class; denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 55 Motion for Summary Judgment (CP)
July 10, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 66 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 69 Motion to Certify Questions. (CP)
July 8, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2012 at 12:15 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 7/8/2011 to correct time of hearing. (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delorme v. Autos Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RW Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Opperude
Represented By: Kraig A. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Westby
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autos Inc
Represented By: Kraig A. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Delorme
Represented By: Larry M. Baer
Represented By: Robert G. Ackre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]