Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Estate of Marie M. Jeanotte et al

Defendant: Marie M. Jeanotte and United States of America
Plaintiff: Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00077
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Rolette
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying 12 Motion to Stay. (BG)
March 27, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Consolidation of Cases by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 17, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/2/2012 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 6, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for dispositive motions deadlines, bench trial, and expert disclosure deadlines re the issue of "use and necessity." Bench Trial set 11/13/2012 is rescheduled for 2/20/2013 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Status Conference set for 9/11/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 13, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 11/7/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. All expert disclosures re the issue of use and necessity are due by 11/01/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 5, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 46 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Responses to CPEC's 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Use and Necessity are due by 10/26/2012. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 26, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 53 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to CPEC'S Summary Judgment Motion on the Issue of Use and Necessity. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 21, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 12/4/2012 at 9:00 AM in Minot Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 23, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the parties' 69 Joint Stipulation Staying all Deadlines. All pending pretrial deadlines are stayed and pending motions are held in abeyance until further order of the court. The bench trial set for 2/20/2013 is canceled. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Estate of Marie M. Jeanotte et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie M. Jeanotte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Debra L. Hoffarth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]