Carter et al v. EOG Resources, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dawn Carter
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc., Crude Processing, Inc., Superior Well Services, Inc. and Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00003
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 136 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas P. Kane. (BG) NEF regenerated to Kane on 7/9/2014. (rm)
July 24, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard J. Bortnick. (BG) Regenerated to Attorney Richard J. Bortnick on 7/24/2012 (kmk).
November 29, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 11, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/25/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 25, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Clarifying Status of Parties. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 28, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond. RES Investments, LLC shall have until 3/10/2014 to respond to 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Fourth-Party Complaint Against RES Investments, LLC. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
March 6, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 64 Motion to Bifurcate; denying 64 Motion to Stay. (KT)
March 17, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gary M. Klinger. (KT) NEF regenerated to Klinger on 3/17/2014. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. EOG Resources, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crude Processing, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Well Services, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Storslee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: M. Daniel Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]