Mosley v. Alpha Oil and Gas Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Chadrick D. Mosley
Defendant: Alpha Oil and Gas Services, Inc. and C & G Construction, Inc. of Clearbrook
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00056
Filed: May 18, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
January 16, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER adopting 17 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 4/15/2013. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/13/2013. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/10/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2013. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 5/13/2013. Threshold Motions due by 5/1/2013. Plaintiff's amendments re punitive damages due 5/13/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 14, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER adopting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant C&G Construction, Inc. of Clearbrook. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 17, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER Setting Pretrial Deadlines. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
August 2, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 26 Motion to Amend Complaint to Assert Punitive Damages. (KT)
October 15, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER adopting 76 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
June 13, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mosley v. Alpha Oil and Gas Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadrick D. Mosley
Represented By: Jonathan P. Norrie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Oil and Gas Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Udland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & G Construction, Inc. of Clearbrook
Represented By: Robert J. Udland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]