Hoy v. Soo Line Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Howard Hoy
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00088
Filed: July 3, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Wells
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 23, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Stipulation (Scheduling/Discovery Plan). Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2013., Discovery due by 12/31/2013. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/30/2013. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Rep orts due by 12/31/2013. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/15/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2013. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 8/30/2013. Threshold Motions due by 8/30/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 24, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sally J. Ferguson. (BG)
July 25, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 3, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 58 Motion to Continue; finding as moot 65 Motion for Separate Trial. (KT)
September 25, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Stipulation(s) for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint at Docket Nos. 6 and 7 . By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hoy v. Soo Line Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Hoy
Represented By: Michael F. Tello
Represented By: Michael P. McReynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company
Represented By: James J. Ranheim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]