Belcourt Public School District et al v. Davis et al

Counter_defendant: Angel Poitra and Belcourt Public School District
Plaintiff: Belcourt Public School District and Angel Poitra
Defendant: Ella Davis and Turtle Mountain Tribal Court
Counter_claimant: Ella Davis
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00114
Filed: August 27, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Rolette
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER of Consolidation of Pretrial Proceedings, Hearings, and Trial. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
October 31, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
February 4, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and remanding case to the Turtle Mountain Tribal Court. (SH)
October 4, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Belcourt Public School District et al v. Davis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Angel Poitra
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Belcourt Public School District
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belcourt Public School District
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Poitra
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Davis
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Mountain Tribal Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ella Davis
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]