Belcourt Public School District et al v. Herman et al

Counter_defendant: School Board Members for the Belcourt Public School District, Belcourt Public School District and Roman Marcellais
Plaintiff: Belcourt Public School District, Roman Marcellais and School Board Members for the Belcourt Public School District
Defendant: Steve Herman and Turtle Mountain Tribal Court
Counter_claimant: Steve Herman
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00118
Filed: August 27, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Rolette
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER of Consolidation of Pretrial Proceedings, Hearings, and Trial. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
November 1, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 4, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and remanding case to the Turtle Mountain Tribal Court. (SH)
October 4, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Belcourt Public School District et al v. Herman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: School Board Members for the Belcourt Public School District
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Belcourt Public School District
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Roman Marcellais
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belcourt Public School District
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Marcellais
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: School Board Members for the Belcourt Public School District
Represented By: Jonathan P. Sanstead
Represented By: Tiffany L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Herman
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Mountain Tribal Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Steve Herman
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]