Gustafson et al v. Poitra et al

Defendant: Raymond Poitra and Linus Poitra
Plaintiff: Darrel Gustafson and Janine Gustafson
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00129
Filed: October 1, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Rolette
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting Gustafsons' 5 Motion for TRO. (QF)
January 21, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/30/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 1/21/2014. (rh)
January 30, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/30/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 29, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER: Status Conference REset for 5/7/2014 at 3:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previously set for 4/30/2014) (BG)
May 7, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER Setting Discovery Deadlines and Bench Trial: Plaintiffs and Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/15/2014. Discovery due by 9/15/2014. Bench Trial set for 10/21/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days, #2 on civil calendar). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gustafson et al v. Poitra et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Poitra
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linus Poitra
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Gustafson
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Gustafson
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]