Hardesty Trucking, LLC v. Mann Enterprises, LLC

Counter_defendant: Hardesty Trucking, LLC
Counter_claimant: Mann Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Hardesty Trucking, LLC
Defendant: Mann Enterprises, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00138
Filed: October 16, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2013 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 7, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (BG)
December 2, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 29, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hardesty Trucking, LLC v. Mann Enterprises, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Hardesty Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Ryan R. West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Mann Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Irvin B. Nodland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardesty Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Ryan R. West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mann Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Irvin B. Nodland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]