United States of America v. Persons Service Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Persons Service Company, LLC, Byrd Brothers Emergency Services, LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 4:2012cv00153
Filed: November 6, 2012
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 7, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 14, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER (AMENDED) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 8/30/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 9/13/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2013, except amendments re punitive damages due by 10/18/2013. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 1/15/2014. Threshold Motions due by 1/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2014. (Amendment re deadline for Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures). (BG)
April 28, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 36 Stipulation of Dismissal of Persons Service Company. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 30, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Connor L. Cantrell. (BG)
November 7, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 65 Motion to Stay; granting 66 Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall file a status update with the court on or before 5/1/2015. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Persons Service Company, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher J. Nyhus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Persons Service Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byrd Brothers Emergency Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]