Century Surety Company v. Jim Hipner LLC et al

Defendant: Abraham Reyes, Jose Chavez, Jim Hipner LLC, Robert Lopez and Huey Brock
Plaintiff: Century Surety Company
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00164
Filed: December 4, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 7, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 16, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 28 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 1/31/2014. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/7/2014. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/7/2014. Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/7/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
April 22, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Schedule for Briefing re Discovery Dispute. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
December 17, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradford S. Moyer. (KT)
September 3, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Cancelling Trial and Final Pretrial Conference. The Bench Trial set for 10/7/2014 and the Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2014 are CANCELLED and will be reset at a later date if necessary. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
September 3, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 10/28/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
December 17, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick E. Winters. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Century Surety Company v. Jim Hipner LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Reyes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Chavez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hipner LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huey Brock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century Surety Company
Represented By: Bradford S. Moyer
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Represented By: Patrick E. Winters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]