Bituminous Casualty Corporation v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bituminous Casualty Corporation
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC and St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00167
Filed: December 13, 2012
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC and St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company have until 2/15/2013 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
February 14, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Amended Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC and St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company have until 6/12/2013 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
January 15, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin J. Cook. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bituminous Casualty Corporation v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bituminous Casualty Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J. Cook
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]