Great West Casualty Company v. National Casualty Company

Defendant: National Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00012
Filed: January 28, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Burke
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
October 28, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott W. McMickle. (BG) NEF regenerated to McMickle on 10/28/2013. (rm)
June 4, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Great West Casualty Company v. National Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Tamara L. Novotny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]