Gerald E. Solberg Trust v. EOG Resources, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gerald E. Solberg Trust
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00020
Filed: February 11, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
April 18, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 7 Stipulation Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
February 12, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/4/2014 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 18, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gerald E. Solberg Trust v. EOG Resources, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald E. Solberg Trust
Represented By: Todd A. Sattler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]