Burckhard et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al

Defendant: BNSF Railway Company and CUSA ES, LLC
Plaintiff: Corrie Burckhard and Maria Mack
Case Number: 4:2013cv00038
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re designation of deposition testimony and submission of exhibit and witness lists: Exhibit and witness lists due by 12/1/2014. The court shall conduct a status conference by telephone with the parties on 12/2/2014 at 2:00 PM CST to review exhibit lists. The court shall initiate the conference call. Designations, counter-designations and objections respectively due by December 1, 4, and 8, 2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 29, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randy J. Cox; granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher L. Decker; granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott M. Stearns. (BG)
May 29, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 26, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John L. Wright; granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James R. Halverson. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorneys on 7/26/2013. (rm)
July 31, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob Tomczik. (BG)
March 3, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference re: Discovery Dispute set for 3/4/2014 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 4, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas M. Flaskamp; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard L. Carlson (BG) (Main Document replaced on 4/4/2013 to correct date of order, NEF regenerated to all attorneys. (rm).
May 8, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 62 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 7/18/2014. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/30/2014. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/22/2014. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses to be completed by 9/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 15, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 59 Motion to Limit Examination. (KT)
October 10, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER QBE may file a motion to compel in Case No. 4:13-cv-125 once the court has disposed of defendants' 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 25, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burckhard et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: James S. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSA ES, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrie Burckhard
Represented By: Cortney S. LeNeave
Represented By: Charles R. Isakson
Represented By: Thomas M. Flaskamp
Represented By: Richard L. Carlson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Mack
Represented By: Richard L. Carlson
Represented By: Thomas M. Flaskamp
Represented By: Charles R. Isakson
Represented By: Cortney S. LeNeave
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]