Major Drilling America, Inc. v. Redemption Energy, LLC

Defendant: Redemption Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Major Drilling America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00048
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 6 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 11 Motion for Bill of Costs. (BG)
June 4, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 10, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2014 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
July 12, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 17 Motion for Relief from State Court Temporary Injunctive Order. (KT)
November 22, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 35 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major Drilling America, Inc. v. Redemption Energy, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redemption Energy, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. Hoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Drilling America, Inc.
Represented By: Garrett D. Ludwig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]