Mashburn et al v. Sandusky et al

Defendant: City of Minot, Minot Police Department, Charles S. Johnson, Dan Maroney, Darren Dyke, Jason Sundbakken, Caisee Sandusky, Jay Rasberry, Collin Ferguson, Joseph Brann, Marina Carrillo Matthews and Miranda Nichols
Plaintiff: Jessica Nichole Mashburn and Thomas James Mashburn
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00062
Filed: June 5, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 13, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The parties shall call the number and enter the access code provided by separate email. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
November 17, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 83 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Plan and Resetting Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial. Discovery due by 5/1/2015. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/1/2015. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosu res and Reports due by 6/30/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2015. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 5/20/2015. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 11/24/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Previously set for 6/9/2015. The court will provide a number for the parties to call prior to the conference call. Jury Trial reset for 12/7/2015 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (10 days). Previously set for 6/22/2015. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 15, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion to Extend Time Limit for Service; granting 6 Motion for Service by Publication. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mashburn et al v. Sandusky et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minot
Represented By: Christopher J. Thompson
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minot Police Department
Represented By: Christopher J. Thompson
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Johnson
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Represented By: Christopher J. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Maroney
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Represented By: Christopher J. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Dyke
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Represented By: Christopher J. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Sundbakken
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caisee Sandusky
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Rasberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin Ferguson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Brann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina Carrillo Matthews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Nichole Mashburn
Represented By: Kerry S. Rosenquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas James Mashburn
Represented By: Kerry S. Rosenquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]