Western Home Transport, Inc. v. Hexco, LLC

Plaintiff: Western Home Transport, Inc.
Defendant: Hexco, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00076
Filed: June 28, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 25, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Post-Hearing Submissions. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
June 26, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Cancelling Trial and Final Pretrial Conference. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
June 27, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. (KT)
September 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Western Home Transport, Inc. v. Hexco, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Home Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Williams
Represented By: Ryan C. McCamy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hexco, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]