Doubek et al v. Halcon Resources Corporation et al

Defendant: Halcon Resources Corporation, HRC Operating, LLC and Northern Oilfield Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Mosbrucker and Justin Doubek
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00086
Filed: July 23, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 26, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2015 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 20, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 15 Joint Stipulation to Amend Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 8/1/2014. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/1/2014. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 23, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert C. Trenchard, Jr. (KT) NEF regenerated to Trenchard on 7/23/2013. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doubek et al v. Halcon Resources Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halcon Resources Corporation
Represented By: Steven A. Storslee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRC Operating, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Storslee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Oilfield Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mosbrucker
Represented By: Robert C. Trenchard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Doubek
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]